Pettis v. Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Charlotte Pettis
Defendant: Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01980
Filed: July 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JUDGMENT in favor of Charlotte Pettis against Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC pursuant to the 24 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, by Clerk on 5/13/2014. (eseam)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CIVIL TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/19/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2014. Two Day Jury Trial set for 9/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/11/2014. (eseam)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/14 Granting 20 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Discovery Cutoff Date and the Dispositive Motion Deadline. Discovery due by 5/16/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference, Trial Preparation Conference and Jury Trial are VACATED. (lgale)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 7/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Two (2) day Jury Trial set for 8/4/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/22/13. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettis v. Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC
Represented By: Irvin Allen Borenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Pettis
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?