Lester v. City of Lafayette, Coloardo
Plaintiff: Mary Lester
Defendant: City of Lafayette, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2013cv01997
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 108 Objections to Costs Taxed by the Clerk. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/06/2015. (athom, )
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER; 110 Ralph Lamaer's Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds in the Court's Registry is GRANTED and 112 Motion for Indicative Ruling is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/8/15.(morti, )
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER granting 97 Motion to Stay. Judge Arguello's Order Affirming Magistrate Judge's Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Docket No. 92 ) is STAYED until 15 business days after the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals rules on the forthcoming appeal in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/12/2015. (athom, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2015. (shart)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 46 Defendant's Motion for Costs and Attorney Fees. Plaintiff Mary Lester and Plaintiff's Attorney Ralph Emerson Lamar, IV, shall, jointly and severally, pay to Defendant City of Lafayette, Colorado the sum of $4,556.50 in attorney fees and $118.73 in costs on or before 8/15/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/16/2014.(emill)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Exclude. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/09/2014. (athom, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER denying 22 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/28/14.(dkals, )
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/9/13. (dkals, )
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/30/2013. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester v. City of Lafayette, Coloardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lester
Represented By: Ralph Emerson Lamar, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lafayette, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?