Mason et al v. Fantasy LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Mason, Michelle Cross, Allison Stebbing and Jamie Tencza
Defendant: Fantasy, LLC and Kevin Eardley
Case Number: 1:2013cv02020
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER re: 106 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2015 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 11/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Pretrial Order due on or before 11/3/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/9/15.(morti, )
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 79 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Status Report due by 8/10/2015. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/27/2015. (athom, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying 71 Motion for Leave; granting 76 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; denying as moot 83 Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/2015.(tscha, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER re 82 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is STAYED in its entirety based on the automatic stay requirement of 11 U.S.C. § 362. However, as to Defendant Fantasy, the Court will adjudicate the Motion to Stay 83 when it is fully briefed and determine then whether the stay should be lifted. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/20/2015. (tscha, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER adopting 55 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs' 44 Partially Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is granted in part, and denied in part, to wit, the Court: (i) GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to the extent it seeks to add as named Plaintiffs all persons who have filed the Consent to Join forms on the docket (ECF Nos. 9 , 10 , 17 , 20 , 21 , 22 , 32 , 33 ); (ii) DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to the extent it seeks to add factual allegations and legal claims. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/30/2015. (alowe)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Motion to Vacate and Reset Final Pretrial Conference. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2015. Final Pretrial Conference is now set for 1/15/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/24/2014.(tscha, )
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/14. Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Class Certification and Expert Disclosure Deadlines 41 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order [#25] is amended to extend the following de adlines: Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline August 18, 2014; Class Certification Deadline August 25, 2014; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline September 17, 2014. Discovery due by 9/17/2014 for the limited purpose of allowing expert disclosures. (lgale)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/23/14 Granting Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Expert Disclosure Deadlines 38 . Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline July 7, 2014. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline August 7, 2014. (lgale)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/11/14. (lag)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is extended to March 5, 2014. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/21/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason et al v. Fantasy LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mason
Represented By: Darren M. Jankord
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Represented By: Mari Anne Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cross
Represented By: Darren M. Jankord
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Represented By: Mari Anne Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Stebbing
Represented By: Darren M. Jankord
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Represented By: Mari Anne Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Tencza
Represented By: Darren M. Jankord
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Represented By: Mari Anne Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantasy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Eardley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?