Cheyenne Hotel Investments, LLC v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Hotel Investments, LLC
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company and Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv02027
Filed: July 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT by Clerk re 35 : Defendant Colorado Casualty Insurance Company's motion for summary judgment 25 is granted dismissing this civil action with prejudice and awarding costs to the defendant upon the filing of a Bill of Costs pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, by Clerk on 5/28/2014. (jsmit)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Dismiss Party Westfield Insurance Company WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/9/2014.(rpmcd)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 18 : plaintiff shall file with this court the Third Amended Plan of Reorganization Dated August 5, 2013, and the Joint Agreed Stipulation Between Homewood Suites Franchise LLC and Cheyenne Hotel Investments, LLC Regarding Rights of the Debtor to Assume the Franchise License Agreement filed on August 9, 2013, and approved by the Court on August 13, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/4/2013. (rpmcd)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/2/2013 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 26, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/8/2013. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheyenne Hotel Investments, LLC v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Hotel Investments, LLC
Represented By: Saira Parvez Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lyndsay K. Arundel
Represented By: Troy R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?