Citizen Awareness Project, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Citizen Awareness Project, Inc.
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service and USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv02127
Filed: August 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7431 Civil damages for unauth disclosure returns & info
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter REMAINS SET for a three-day bench trial beginning 10/19/2015, with a Final Trial Preparation Conference at 2:00 PM on 10/2/2015 in Courtroom A801. By Judge William J. Martinez on 5/6/2015. (alowe)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/14/14 re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 32 . The Motion to Compel is GRANTED. (bsimm, )
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/25/14 re: Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Vacate Final Pretrial Conference 29 . The Motion is GRANTED. Discovery due by 10/29/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for December 15, 2014, is vacated and reset to 3/4/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/25/2015. (bsimm, )
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Vacate Final Pretrial Conference. Discovery due by 8/29/2014; Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2014; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/8/2014; Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 12/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/25/2014.(evana, )
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 the Stipulated Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs Jury Demand, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/19/2013.(ervsl, )
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for a Stay In Light of Lapse of Appropriations. The scheduling conference set for 11/25/13 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. Status Report due at the earlier of ten days after appropriations are restored to the Department ofJustice or 12/2/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/13.(bnbcd, )
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/23/2013. (ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizen Awareness Project, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizen Awareness Project, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Toomey Sheehy
Represented By: John Louis Skari, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: John Stuart Zakhem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?