Wall v. Rodman et al
Plaintiff: Richard Wall
Defendant: William Rodman, M.D. and Aspen Valley Hospital
Case Number: 1:2013cv02158
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings. The reply is due on or before June 4, 2014, and is limited to five (5) pages. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/28/2014.(trlee, )
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/12/14. An evidentiary hearing is set for June 18, 2014, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 401. The plaintiff and each of his lawyers must be present at the hearing in person. The plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings With Certain Treating Physicians 51 on or before May 19, 2014. (bsimm, )
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 70 Motion for Leave to file reply, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/24/2014.(trlee, )
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/15/14. (bsimm)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/3/14. The Motion to Withdraw 55 is GRANTED. Aaron P. Bradford and Lauren E. Sykes no longer represent any party to this litigation and are to be removed from the electronic service. (bsimm)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/6/14 re: MOTION to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions 35 is GRANTED. The plaintiff shall provide full and complete responses to the discovery and produce responsive documents on or before March 14, 20 14. Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to F. R. Civ. P. 37(c)(1) 36 is DENIED. The plaintiff shall comply with the Scheduling Order and shall, on or before March 21, 2014, supplement the Scheduling Order with a good faith estimate of the economic damages claimed. (Simmons, B.)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Dismiss Party Aspen Valley Hospital, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/24/2014.(trlee, )
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/25/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/23/13. (alvsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Rodman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rodman, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Valley Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wall
Represented By: David Neal Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?