September 22, 2015 |
Filing
229
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion to Stay Dispositive Motions Deadline by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/22/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/29/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(mdave, )
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing
220
ORDER denying 215 Third Party Defendant's Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal, by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/10/2015.(cthom, )
|
August 19, 2015 |
Filing
211
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 206 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Date to File Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 208 Motion to Stay Dispositive Motion Deadline by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2015. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(mdave, )
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
204
ORDER regarding discovery hearing/in camera review held on 08/12/2015 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/11/2015. (mdave, )
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
199
MINUTE ORDER denying 197 Motion to Compel Defendant WCA to Cooperate or Stipulate, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/30/2015.(slibi, )
|
July 22, 2015 |
Filing
191
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty granting 177 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 180 Motion to Compel. Mr. Breen is to produce all requested documents to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Hegarty on or before 7/29/2015 for an in camera review. Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2015. Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave, )
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
186
MINUTE ORDER granting 184 Motion for Leave by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/15/2015. Mr. Breen may appear at the hearing by calling chambers at (303) 844-4507 at the appointed time.(mdave, )
|
June 17, 2015 |
Filing
176
ORDER GRANTING IN PART THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS 142 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports of WCA. The expert reports of David Rickert are STRICKEN, by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/17/2015.(cthom, )
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
174
MINUTE ORDER granting 172 Motion for Leave to Participate in Status Conference by Phone by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/1/2015.(mdave, ) Modified on 6/2/2015 to edit text (mdave, ).
|
April 17, 2015 |
Filing
166
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Ruling Regarding Application of Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order; Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave )
|
April 7, 2015 |
Filing
165
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 163 Plaintiff's Motion for a Stay of Certain Proceedings and Rescheduling of Deadlines to Accommodate the Stay. The Court will impose a temporary stay of the proceedings (except for the 4/17/2 015, hearing that will proceed as scheduled) until 6/10/2015 at 10:15 AM at which time the Court will hold a Status Conference to discuss rescheduling all remaining discovery deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for 5/8/2015, is vacated, and will be rescheduled at the Status Conference. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/7/2015.(alowe)
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
135
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: denying 128 Motion for Protective Order Relating to the Notice of Deposition of Plaintiffs' Counsel by Plaintiff; Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing
120
ORDER OVERRULING 102 THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL AND ORDER RE: SANCTIONS. Judge Hegarty's Orders (ECF Nos. 79 & 91 are AFFIRMED and ADOPTED in their entirety, and Third-Party Defendant John E. Breen is sanctioned in the amount of $2,160.00 to be paid to counsel for the Defendants no later than 1/2/2015. Breen shall file a Notice of Compliance with this Order no later than 1/9/2015. By Judge William J. Martinez on 12/12/2014. (alowe)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
119
ORDER ADOPTING THE 110 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Third-Party Defendant John E. Breen's 66 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint as Amended is DENIED. By Judge William J. Martinez on 12/9/2014. (alowe)
|
September 15, 2014 |
Filing
106
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Compel; denying 62 Motion for Costs; granting in part a nd denying in part 74 Motion to Compel; denying 82 Motion for Leave; denying 92 Motion for Leave; denying as moot 93 Motion to Expedite; Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2014; Discovery due by 2/27/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: MEH Courtroom A501. (mdave) Modified on 9/15/2014 to edit text (mdave).
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
91
ORDER that Third-Party Defendant Breen be sanctioned in the amount of $2,160.00, to be paid to counsel for WCA as a reasonable sanction of attorneys fees. This amount shall be paid no later than September 12, 2014. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Compliance with Order re: Sanctions on or before September 19, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2014. (evana, )
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
79
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Defendants and Third Party- Plaintiffs WCA Logistics, LLC and WCA Logistics II, LLCs (collectively, WCA) Motion to Compel Disclosure of Insurance Information, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/30/2014.(evana, )
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
49
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2014. (cpear)
|
March 28, 2014 |
Filing
43
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 39 The proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, improperly filed as a "motion" in this case, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/28/2014. (cpear)
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
36
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2014, denying without prejudice 30 Third Party Defendant, John E. Breen's, Motion to Amend Case Scheduling Order and to Expand Limitations on the Use of Written Discovery. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
|
December 16, 2013 |
Filing
25
MINUTE ORDER granting 23 the Stipulated Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/16/2013. (mehcd)
|