Mancia Rivera v. Carniceria y Verduleria Guadalajara Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter Orlando Mancia Rivera
Defendant: Carniceria y Verduleria Guadalajara Inc. and Sergio Evangelista
Case Number: 1:2013cv02309
Filed: August 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE 1. That the Notice of Final Accounting of Class Fund by Settlement Administrator 91 , filed December 31, 2015, is approved; 2. That under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this action is closed administratively; and 3. That under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, the clerk of the court is directed to close this civil action administratively, subject to reopening for good cause, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/11/2016. (evana, )
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) Collective and Fed.R. Civ. P. 23(e) Class Action Settlement. A hearing to consider final approval of the proposed settlement and any request for attorney fees and costs shall be held on Friday, 7/31/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/9/2015. (alowe)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 9/30/2014. In light of additional information provided to the Court, the Court reconsiders its order and the court order 65 is VACATED. Granting in part and denying in part 63 parties' Joint Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Deadlines, Vacate Trial, and Extend FLSA Tolling While the Parties Pursue Settlement. Motion is granted as to the STAY of the Scheduling Order and the FLSA tolling; Denied in that the parties must move to have the trial dates vacated by Judge Blackburn. Status Conference set for 11/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER denying 63 Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Scheduling OrderDeadlines, Vacate Trial, and Extend FLSA Tolling While the Parties Pursue Settlement, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/23/2014.(emill)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 4/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Six (6) day Jury Trial set 4/27/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/12/14. (rebsec)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion for Class Certification Under Fed.R.Civ.P.23 and Approval of FLSA Tolling. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/2014.(klyon, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Unopposed Motion to Vacate the 1/14/14 Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2014 at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED. The court will hold a Status Conference in this matter on 1/14/2014 at 2:00 p.m. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/2/2014.(klyon, )
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 defendants' Unopposed Motion to Place Case in Suspense to Allow the Parties to Continue there [sic] Settlement Negotiations. Case deadlines are stayed. Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2013. Scheduling Conference remains set 1/14/2014 11:00 AM. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/2/2013.(mjwcd)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting 25 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule 12/9/13 Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 12/9/2013 09:30 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/14/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/2013.(mjwcd)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 12/9/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/17/2013. (klyon, )
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 5 MOTION for Leave to Restrict Document filed by Walter Orlando Mancia Rivera, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/17/2013. (skl)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/03/13 GRANTING 4 Motion to Strike Document 2 ; and ORDERED that Plaintiff will be allowed ten (10) days from the date of this order in which to filed an amended motion to restrict access that complies with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2.(nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancia Rivera v. Carniceria y Verduleria Guadalajara Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Orlando Mancia Rivera
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carniceria y Verduleria Guadalajara Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Evangelista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?