Mullin v. Hyatt Residential Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ian Mullin
Defendant: Hyatt Residential Group, Inc. and Hyatt Residential Marketing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv02348
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Exclude. By Judge William J. Martinez on 3/27/2015.(tscha, )
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED ORDER denying 27 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge William J. Martinez on 3/10/2015. [Order is amended to correct citation] (alowe)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 27 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge William J. Martinez on 3/9/2015.(alowe)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/7/14. (bsimm, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the attached Exhibit B, Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, for filing by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/02/14.(jjhsl, )
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/9/13. (bnbcd, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/18/2013. (ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullin v. Hyatt Residential Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Mullin
Represented By: Clayton Earl Wire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Residential Group, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Residential Marketing Corporation
Represented By: David G. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?