Reeves v. Greening, et al
Plaintiff: Mark L. Reeves
Defendant: Janice M. Greening and Law Firm of Janice M. Greening, LLC, The
Case Number: 1:2013cv02398
Filed: September 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal with prejudice Doc. 44 it is ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/6/2015. (evana, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 4/20/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2014. (jsmit)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 10/1/2014 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2014, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/2014. (jsmit)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT ON CERTAIN CLAIMS by Clerk re 30 : judgment is entered against the plaintiff and for the defendants Janice M. Greening and The Law Firm of Janice M. Greening, LLC, (Janice M. Greening, LLC), on the First and Third Claims for Relief, and the Second Claim for Relief judgment is entered against the plaintiff and for the defendant Janice M. Greening, LLC, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/19/2014. (jsmit )
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 7/22/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2014, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/25/2014. (jsmit)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/18/14. A Settlement Conference set for 5/9/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. On or before 5/2/14, the parties shall have exchanged settlement offers and demands in anticipation of the settlement conference. (bsimm)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER in all court filings, counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the, re 15 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/7/2014. (jsmit)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/6/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 27, 2013 and lead counsel present. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/18/2013. (rpmcd )
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 5 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/4/2013.(rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Greening, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark L. Reeves
Represented By: John W. McKendree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice M. Greening
Represented By: Alan Peter Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Janice M. Greening, LLC, The
Represented By: Alan Peter Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?