Martensen v. Koch
Plaintiff: Kirby Martensen
Defendant: William Koch
Case Number: 1:2013cv02411
Filed: September 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/3/15. All pending deadlines and hearings are vacated, and all currently pending motions are denied as moot. (dkals, )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: In Court Hearing held on 3/3/2015. Granting in part and denying in part 146 Motion for Sanctions. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER: Plaintiff's 221 Motion in Limine to Precude Expert Testimony of David A. Hall, or, in the Alternative, for a Daubert Hearing is DENIED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. Plaintiff's 225 Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendant William Koch from Introducing or Referring to Documents from Nova Industry Company Limited is DENIED without prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/6/2015. (alowe)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER denying 220 Motion In Limine To Preclude Expert Testimony of Louis J. Freeh by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/4/15.(dkals, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting 277 Motion to Exclude Testimony by Darrell D. Hallett and Strike His Expert Report. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/30/2015.(alowe)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting 252 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Oxbow's Organizational Structure and Alleged Tax Violations. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/28/2015.(alowe)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting 240 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Kochs Wealth or Other Lawsuits. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/26/2015. (alowe)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting 242 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Polygraph Results. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/22/2015.(alowe)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER denying without prejudice 224 Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendant William Koch from Referring to District Attorney's Decision Not to Prosecute Defendant for the Crime of False Imprisonment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/21/2015.(alowe)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 10/16/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set 11/2/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/21/14. (rebsec)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTE ORDER granting 211 Motion for Leave to file response to Defendant William Koch's Objections to Magistrate Judge Shaffer's July 29, 2014 Order Compelling Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privileged Communications and Attorney Work Product 198 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/26/2014.(trlee, )
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony; granting 82 Motion for Leave to Extend Time Limit; granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Compel Production of Documents; denying 123 Motion to Compel Non-Party Deposition Testimony and Production of Documents, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/29/14.(cbsint1, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Adopting 151 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant William I. Koch's Motion To Dismiss Revised Fourth Amended Complaint and To Strike Portions of Revised Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 111, filed 4/1/14) [# 116 ], filed is April 11, 2013, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/7/2014.(klyon, )
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendants, Oxbow Carbon, LLC, Oxbow Carbon & Minerals, LLC and Oxbow Carbon & Minerals International GmbH, Only. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/1/2014. (klyon, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendants, Michael McAuliffe and Richard Callahan, Only. Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice [# 91 ] filed February26, 2014, is APPROVED. Plaintiff's claims against defendants, Michael McAuliffe and Richard Callahan, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/26/2014. (klyon, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2014. ORDERED: 56 Motion to Amend and File Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is acc epted for filing as of today's date. ORDERED: 60 Motion for Leave to Restrict is DENIED. ORDERED: 36 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot without prejudice. ORDERED: Defendants' new Motion to Dismiss directed to Plaintiff's Third A mended Complaint shall be filed by 1/21/2014. Response due 2/11/2014. A Motion Hearing regarding Defendants' new Motion to Dismiss is set for 2/24/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Written Reply due 2/1 8/2014, or counsel may present its Reply at the hearing. ORDERED: A Status Conference is set for 1/22/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. All counsel are to be physically present. All discovery in the case shall be STAYED between now and the hearing set for 1/22/2014. ORDERED: Each side shall submit a Status Report by 1/17/2014. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/31/13. ORDERED that parties MUST fully comply with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2 and D.C.COLO. ECF. PROC. 6.1. (cbssec)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 10/17/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 11/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/24/13. (rebsec, )
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2013. Discovery due by 6/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2014. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 2:30 PM and Trial set to begin 11/3/2014 at 8:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, separate order to issue. ORDERED: Counsel shall submit to the court for approval a non-contentious proposed protective order within seven (7) da ys of today's date. ORDERED: 7 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Amend and File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Second Amended Complaint is accepted for filing as of today's date. ORDERED: 26 Joint Motion to Restrict is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to place Exhibit K to Declaration of John Houston Scott (Doc. No. 24-12) under level one restriction. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 10/23/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/9/13. (cbssec)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 6 Defendant William I. Koch's Notice of Motion and Motion For Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of April30, 2013 Order: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/6/2013.(klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martensen v. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Martensen
Represented By: William Allan Cohan
Represented By: Brian Keith Gearinger
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Koch
Represented By: Timothy R. Beyer
Represented By: John Charles Hueston
Represented By: Moez Mansoor Kaba
Represented By: Melissa Rush McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?