Addison Insurance Company v. Thebeau Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Addison Insurance Company
Defendant: Thebeau Enterprises, Inc and Wayne Thebeau
Case Number: 1:2013cv02435
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2014. ORDERED: 26 (Second) Motion to Stay Action or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Claim for Relief is GRANTED to the extent it seeks to stay this action and WITHDRAWN to the extent it seeks to dismiss Plaintiff's First Claim for Relief. The case shall be STAYED pending further order from the court. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 11/18/2013. ORDERED: Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint on or before 12/9/2013. All discovery shall be STAYED pending the filing of an Amended Complaint and the setting of a further Scheduling Conference. ORDERED: Defense counsel's oral Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice is GRANTED. 16 Motion to Stay, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and 17 Motion for Ruling Concerning Due Date for Answer are WITHDRAWN without prejudice. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 11/18/2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/18/13. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison Insurance Company v. Thebeau Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thebeau Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Thebeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addison Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?