Morales et al v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Plaintiff: Tara Morales and Fernando Morales
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange and Mid Century Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv02437
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/27/2014. (klyon, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 10/31/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 11/17/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/2/14. (rebsec,)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/2/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/9/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales et al v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Morales
Represented By: James Richard Koncilja
Represented By: Christopher Lewis Cawlfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Morales
Represented By: James Richard Koncilja
Represented By: Christopher Lewis Cawlfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?