Trinity Property Consultants, LLC v. Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Trinity Property Consultants, LLC
Defendant: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv02451
Filed: September 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Agreed Motion to Modify Amended Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/30/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/30/15. (ktera)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Agreed Motion to Modify Amended Scheduling Order. Deadlines for discovery cut-off and dispositive motions are extended to and including November 30, 2015, and December 31, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/25/15.(ktera)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that a pretrial conference is scheduled for January 22, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. Counsel are directed to comply with the Instructi ons for Preparation and Submission of Final Pretrial Order which may be found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/JudicialPracticeStandards/SeniorArticleIII Judges/HonRichardPMatsch.aspx. The proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 15, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/16/2014. (evana, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/23/2014 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 16, 2014, lead counsel present in person, and initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/20/2013. 7 MOTION to Dismiss terminated per rpm. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Property Consultants, LLC v. Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Property Consultants, LLC
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William K. Rounsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?