German v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Louis D. German
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: Social Security Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv02490
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 07/21/15.(jhawk, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. ORDERED that the Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $5,250.00 by Judge John L. Kane on 07/07/14. (jhawk, )
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINAL JUDGMENT. Plaintiff may have her costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs within fourteen days of entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 04/29/14. (jhawk, )
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Remand. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993) by Judge John L. Kane on 04/28/14.(jhawk, )
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/3/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 4/2/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 4/17/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/22/13. (mfiel, )
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge John L. Kane on 12/23/2013.(klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: German v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis D. German
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: Social Security Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?