Williams v. McKee, et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Williams
Defendant: Delta County, Colorado and Fred D. McKee
Case Number: 1:2013cv02546
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Delta
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants Fred D. McKee, Debbie Griffith, and Delta County, Colorado. ORDERED that defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerkof the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. by Clerk on 09/16/14. (jhawk, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 20] filed by defendants Fred D. McKee, Debbie Griffith, and Delta County, Colorado is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [Docket No. 38] is R EJECTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint [Docket No. 31] filed by plaintiff Robin L. Williams, as personal representative of the estate of Michael R. Williams, is DENIED. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/15/14.(jhawk, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Attorney Fees by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/12/14.(ggall, )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/7/14.(ggall, )
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 59 Motion to Stay. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/21/2014.(ggall, )
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/19/14.(ggall, )
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and to Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 12/27/2013, to file an Amended Complaint. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/3/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/13.(mnfsl, )
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/20/2013. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. McKee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta County, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred D. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: J. Michael Considine, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?