Crist v. Dorr to Door Pizza LLC
Plaintiff: Narelle A. Crist
Defendant: Dorr to Door Pizza LLC
Counter_claimant: Dorr to Door Pizza LLC
Counter_defendant: Narelle A. Crist
Case Number: 1:2013cv02550
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/30/2015. (cpear)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER setting case for trial. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/11/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A four day Jury Trial is set to commence on 10/13/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/21/2014. (tscha, )
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling order 19 is amended such that the deadline to compete depositions is 8/29/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/22/2014.(emill)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 12/5/2013. Answer and Counterclaim and Jury Demand 7 and Amended Answer and Counterclaim and Jury Demand 8 are stric ken. Plaintiff's Oral Motion to withdraw Plaintiff's motion to strike and to dismiss amended counterclaims is granted; withdrawing without prejudice 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. Defendant corporation to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint 1 on or before 1/17/2014. Scheduling Conference / Show Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/24/2013. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crist v. Dorr to Door Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narelle A. Crist
Represented By: Hugh S. Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorr to Door Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dorr to Door Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Narelle A. Crist
Represented By: Hugh S. Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?