Waynewood v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Petitioner: De'on Waynewood
Respondent: Colorado Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2013cv02561
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 26 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/8/2014. (shart)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 5 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/07/2014. (athom, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Draw. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/02/2014. (skl)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/26/2013. (skl)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/20/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waynewood v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jennifer Susan Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: De'on Waynewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?