Dwier v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Dennis J Dwier
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv02595
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/16/2015.(evana, )
March 25, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the Commissioner for further fact finding as directed in this Order pursuant to sentence four in 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/25/2015. (evana, )
January 24, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/7/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 4/14/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 4/29/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/24/2014. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwier v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J Dwier
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?