Tang v. Hospital Shared Services, Inc
Plaintiff: Eddie C. Tang
Defendant: Hospital Shared Services, Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv02636
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JUDGMENT in favor of HSS Inc. against Eddie C. Tang re: 59 Order. Civil Case Terminated. by Clerk on 3/23/15. (pglov)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2015 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/3/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/20/14. (jhawk, )
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion to Amend Caption. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the defendant name to omit the comma. Defendants name on all future captions should read as follows: HSS INC by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/15/14.(jhawk, )
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Motion to Amend Answer to Amended Complaint. ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the attached Amended Answer by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/26/14.(jhawk, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/13/14. (BWS)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the attached Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. The hearing set for February 12, 2014, is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/6/14.(mfiel, )
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/16/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/25/13. (mnfsl, )
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/02/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. Hospital Shared Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Shared Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?