Amaya v. Mather et al
Petitioner: Ana Silva Amaya
Respondent: Edward Newman, Robert Mather and Eric Holder
Case Number: 1:2013cv02653
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation to Dismiss [# 35 ] filed July 3, 2014, is APPROVED. The clerk is DIRECTED to reopen this civil action. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/2014. (klyon, )
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Of Administrative Closure. Motion For Administrative Closure Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.2 [# 33 ] filed May 6, 2014, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/2014. (klyon, )
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/11/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall prepare a proposed Scheduling Order and submit it to the court on or before February 4, 2014 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/15/14. (jjhsl, )
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Supplemental status conference is set for 1/15/14 at9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Status Report due by 1/8/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/1/13. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amaya v. Mather et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edward Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ana Silva Amaya
Represented By: Catharine Anne Davies
Represented By: Richard Michael Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?