Fidelity National Title Company et al v. First American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Company, Ticor Title of Colorado, Inc. and American Heritage Title Agency, Inc.
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv02807
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/1/16.(dkals, )
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is 37 GRANTED IN PART, insofar as the Court finds that First American's claims accruing prior to December 30, 2007 are barred by the statute of limitation, and DENIED IN PART in all other respects. First American's Motion for Summary Judgment 53 is DENIED. The Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 69 is DENIED AS MOOT . It appearing that this case will be proceeding to trial, the parties shall promptly begin preparation of a Proposed Pretrial Order pursuant to Docket #27 and shall jointly contact chambers to schedule a Final Pretrial Conference. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/20/15.(msksec, )
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 48 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Discovery by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/22/14.(dkals, )
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 33 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. When filing any documents under restriction, the parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2 and D.C.COLO. ECF. PROC. 5.1. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/07/2014. (cbslc1)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/7/14. (msksec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity National Title Company et al v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Company
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ticor Title of Colorado, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Heritage Title Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Echo Dawn Ryan
Represented By: Frederick B. Skillern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?