CSI Inspection, LLC v. Terrebone et al
Plaintiff: CSI Inspection, LLC
Defendant: Titan Inspection Services, L.L.C. and Ross Terrebone
Case Number: 1:2013cv02868
Filed: October 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE on the parties Stipulation for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/29/2014. (evana, )
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER On August 14, 2014, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement ECF No. 46 indicating that this matter has been resolved. Dismissal Paper due by 8/29/2014. Denying as moot 33 Defendants Motion for Determination of Applicable Law, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/15/2014.(evana, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Joint Unopposed Motion for Amendment of the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/14/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2014. Scheduling Order 22 is amended. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/27/2014. (emill)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/2014. (emill)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/23/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/25/13. (jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSI Inspection, LLC v. Terrebone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Inspection Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua Fredrick Bugos
Represented By: Kris John Kostolansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Terrebone
Represented By: Kris John Kostolansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSI Inspection, LLC
Represented By: Mark Scott Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?