Digital Satellite Connections, LLC et al v. DISH Network Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Digital Satellite Connections, LLC and Kathy King
Defendant: DISH Network Corporation, DISH Network, LLC and Dishnet Satellite Broadband, LLC
Counter_claimant: Dishnet Satellite Broadband, LLC, DISH Network Corporation and DISH Network, LLC
Counter_defendant: Dishnet Satellite Broadband, LLC, Dish Network, LLC and DISH Network Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv02934
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Concerning Motion for Attorney Fees and Motion for Review of Costs Taxation. Defendants' Second Renewed Request Under Federal Rules 54(d)(2) for an Award of Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff Kathy King Pursuant to the Terms of the 2010 R etailer Agreement [# 303 ] is granted in part and denied in part as indicated in the attached Order. Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs [Dkt. 310] [# 313 ] is denied. Kathy King and Digital Satellit e Connections, LLC are ordered to pay the costs taxed in the Bill of Costs [# 310 ], 10,607.59 dollars, to Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network, LLC, Dishnet Satellite Broadband, LLC. To the extent costs taxed in the Bill of Costs [# 310 ] duplicate costs documented in the motion for attorney fees [# 303 ], Kathy King and Digital Satellite Connections, LLC need pay such costs only once. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/26/2018. (athom, )
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER denying 232 Defendants' Request under Federal Rule 54(d)(2) for an Award of Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff Kathy King Pursuant to the Terms Of the 2010 Retailer Agreement.The Joint Stipulation Setting the Deadline for Filing Motions for Attorney's Fees 229 is approved. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/8/2015.(mlace, )
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 212 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Entry of an Award of Specific Performance. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/22/2015.(mlace, )
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 185 Motion to Quash Subpoenas Served on DISH Network Senior Executives. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/7/2015. (alowe)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE ORDER granting 209 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Motions in Limine without prejudice. Defendants' 179 Consolidated Motions in Limine Nos. 1-7 filed 10/10/2014, is WITHDRAWN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/5/2014.(alowe)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 201 Motion to Vacate the November 3 Trial Date. The combined Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set Friday, 10/31/2014 at 3:00 PM are VACATED and CONTINUED without date pending further order. The jury trial set to commence Monday, 11/3/2014 is VACATED and CONTINUED without date pending further order. Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/10/2014. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/29/2014.(alowe)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER CONCERNING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction [# 104 , restricted filing # 97 ] is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [# 101 , restricted filing# 100 ], is GRANTED in part. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/20/2014.(alowe)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to File Materials Under Seal. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/18/2014. (alowe)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 COURT MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: denying 93 Motion to Strike; granting 133 Motion for Leave to Restrict; granting 136 Motion for Leave to Restrict. Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2014. FTR: Courtroom A 402. (mdave)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RESTRICT PUBLIC ACCESS: Defendants' 127 Motion for Leave to Restrict Access to the Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael Einhorn and Supporting Materials is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/8/2014. (alowe)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2014. ORDERED: Defendant's Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay of Expert Depositions and Set an Expert Deposition Deadline 87 is GRANTED. All expert depositions MUST be completed by August 22, 2014. ORDERED: MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and For Related Relief 80 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated on the record. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2014. ORDERED: 43 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. The court will require the Plaintiffs to provide narrative responses to Defen dants' Interrogatories Nos. 16 and 17 by close of business on 4/24/2014. Fees and costs will not be awarded. ORDERED: 34 Motion for Sanctions and to Compel Production of Documents is WITHDRAWN without prejudice. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 10/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 11/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/3/14. (rebsec,)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2014. ORDERED: 13 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference is set for 10/17/2014 at 1:30 PM and Trial is set to begin on November 3, 2014 at 8:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, separate order to issue. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Satellite Connections, LLC et al v. DISH Network Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Satellite Connections, LLC
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy King
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISH Network Corporation
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISH Network, LLC
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dishnet Satellite Broadband, LLC
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dishnet Satellite Broadband, LLC
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DISH Network Corporation
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DISH Network, LLC
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dishnet Satellite Broadband, LLC
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dish Network, LLC
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: DISH Network Corporation
Represented By: Erik Craig Kane
Represented By: Margaret C. Lu
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Susan Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?