Gomez v. Macgrew, et al
Petitioner: Gonzalo Gomez
Respondent: Larimer County and State of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2013cv02979
Filed: October 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Reinstating and Dismissing Case, for lack of jurisdiction, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/19/14. (dkals, )
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying without prejudice leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/25/14. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/12/14 DENYING as unnecessary 18 Motion for Re-Instatement of Civil Action and Reconsideration Under59(c) Fed.R.Civ.P.. This action is not dismissed. (nmarb, )
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER To File Pre-Answer Response by the Respondents, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/04/14. (nmarb, )
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/23/14. 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and 6 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence are denied as moot.(dkals, )
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/1/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Macgrew, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larimer County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gonzalo Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?