Bland v. Allan et al
Plaintiff: Amir Bland
Defendant: Ewert, City of Aurora, Micheal (I) Allan, Micheal Allan and (I) Ewert
Case Number: 1:2013cv03000
Filed: November 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 88 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/25/2014. (athom, )
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re: 86 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant Officers Michael Allen and Matthew Ewert are hereby DISMISSED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/24/2014. (athom, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 7/14/2014.Defendants' Oral Motion for Release of the Records of the Arapahoe County Sheriff's Office is granted. Granting 82 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Take Plaintiff's Deposition. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER denying 70 Motion for "Subpena"; denying 73 Motion for Court Appointed Experts Under Rule 706. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/26/2014.(athom, )
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs 60 Motion, Filing Out of Time and 63 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint are both denied for the reasons stated in the defendants Response 68 . By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/10/2014. (athom, )
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/31/14. (dkals, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER denying 50 plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 51 Motion for Production of Documents Under Rule (34). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/11/2014.(mjwcd)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER denying 34 Motion for Stay of Entire Action by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/26/14.(dkals, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying 40 Motion for Production of Documents under Rule (34)(a)(1) by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/13/14.(dkals, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER denying 21 Motion for Production of Documents under Rule 34, 22 Motion for Medical & Mental Health Records, and 23 Motion for D.R.D.C. - Medical & Mental Health Records, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/14.(dkals, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants' 17 Motion for Stay of Entire Action Pursuant to the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act is granted in part and denied in part. The subject motion is granted insofar as a stay shall enter as to Defendant Officer Micha el Allan (Allen) only. Defendants' 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint is granted as follows. Defendant Allen does not have to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint based upon this court's Order above on Defendants' Motion for Stay of Entire Action Pursuant to the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act. The remaining Defendants shall have up to and including February 7, 2014, to Answer or otherwise Respond to the 1 Complaint. The Status Conference set on February 4, 2014, at 9:00 AM, is vacated. Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/3/14.(mnfsl, )
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF. Status Conference set for 2/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/5/2013. (mjwcd)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/02/2013. (skl)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot 6 Motion to File Without Payment of Filing Fee; denying as premature and unnecessary 7 Motion for U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of the Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/26/2013.(skl)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/1/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bland v. Allan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal (I) Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?