Holguin Beltran v. Holder Jr.
Petitioner: Jesus Antonio Holguin Beltran
Respondent: Erick Holder Jr.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03067
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Respondent's Motion to Amend Judgment. The Final Judgment entered on January 23, 2014 is VACATED with regard to the Order requiring ICE to provide Mr. Beltran with an individualized bond hearing pursuant to 8 U.S.C. § 1226(a)(2) within 14 days of entry of the January 16, 2014 Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 ECF No. 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Final Judgment shall be amended accordingly. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Stay Proceedings to Enforce Judgment ECF No. 24 , filed on January 27, 2014, is DENIED as unnecessary, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/29/2014.(evana, )
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/16/14. John Kerry and John Suthers are dismissed. All pending motions are denied as moot. (dkals, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/13/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holguin Beltran v. Holder Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Antonio Holguin Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erick Holder Jr.
Represented By: Johanna Hamburger(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?