Shepherd v. American Numismatic Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larry Shepherd
Defendant: Kimberly Kiick, Thomas Hallenbeck, Ronald Sirna, American Numismatic Association, Inc., Jay Beeton and J.P. Martin
Case Number: 1:2013cv03075
Filed: November 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER. Plaintiff's Submission of Fees Pursuant to Order of the Court 190 is ACCEPTED in part by this court and Plaintiff is hereby awarded sanctions against the Defendants (except not against Defendant Sirna) in the total amount of $2, 915.00. The Defendants, with the exception of Defendant Sirna, shall submit payment in full to Plaintiff's counsel, The Law Offices of Ruth I. Major, P.C., on or before November 1, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/15/14. (sgrim)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendants' Emergency Opposed Motion to Restrict Access to Portions of Plaintiff's Resonses [sic] to Defendants' Summary Jud gment Motions and Request for Hearing 148 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Scheduling Order to Depose Michael Ellis 116 is GRANTED. The court finds the Defendants' objection to the deposition of this witness to be wholly frivolous and groundless. Therefore, Plaintiff is awarded reasonable costs, including attorney fees, incurred in the preparation and presentation of the motion. Plaintiff is directed to submit an accounting on or before September 23, 2014. Any response or objections to the reasonableness of the amount claimed shall be filed on or before October 7, 2014. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim) Modified on 9/18/2014 to correct date of hearing. (sgrim)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 114 August 27, 2014 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge re 25 Motion to Dismiss. Count I is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/15/5014. (athom, )
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel 69 is DENIED IN PART, as discussed. Defendants American Numismatic Association, Inc.'s, Thomas Hallenbeck's, Kimberly Kiick's, Jay Beeton's, and J.P. Martin's Motion to Compel Discovery From Plaintiff 76 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff shall respond to the interrogatories, as discussed. As to the social media issue, subject to Plaintiff's review for privilege and other objections as necessary, the content of Plaintiff's Facebook account shall be turned over to Defendants for the time period 2008 through present as stated on record. The Facebook contents will be provided on or before August 15, 2014. Plaintiff is permitted one additional hour to redepose J.P. Martin, preferably by phone or video, if possible, on or before September 1, 2014. The topic shall be limited to follow up questions regarding the August 17, 2011 executive session meeting. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/31/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd v. American Numismatic Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Kiick
Represented By: Veronica Thea von Grabow
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hallenbeck
Represented By: Veronica Thea von Grabow
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Sirna
Represented By: Tom H. Luetkemeyer
Represented By: Aimee Elizabeth Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Numismatic Association, Inc.
Represented By: Veronica Thea von Grabow
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Beeton
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Represented By: Veronica Thea von Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Martin
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Represented By: Veronica Thea von Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Shepherd
Represented By: Erica H. Suskind
Represented By: Ruth I. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?