Bird Dog, LLC et al v. Liberty Chevrolet Inc.
Plaintiff: Courtney Phillips and Bird Dog, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Chevrolet Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03112
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/29/2014. (athom, )
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/29/14. Consented Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Cutoff to November 14, 2014 42 is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is extended to November 14, 2014. (lgale, )
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/12/14. (lgale)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/27/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 3/16/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/21/14. (kfinn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird Dog, LLC et al v. Liberty Chevrolet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Chevrolet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Phillips
Represented By: Scott Samuel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bird Dog, LLC
Represented By: Scott Samuel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?