Belaski v. Lutheran Social Services of Colorado, et al
Plaintiff: Meghan Belaski
Defendant: Ryan Gray and Lutheran Social Services of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2013cv03207
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own costsand attorneys fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/17/2014 re 30 . (jsmit)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 22 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014. (jsmit)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference re 13 to 4/29/2014 11:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed scheduling order must be submitted in paper form directly to chambers no later than April 22, 2014, at 4:00 p.m. and initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed by April 21, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/8/2014. (jsmit)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/24/2014 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 17, 2014, lead counsel present in person, and initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/19/2014. (jsmit)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/12/2014.(rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belaski v. Lutheran Social Services of Colorado, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutheran Social Services of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Belaski
Represented By: Clayton Earl Wire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?