Williams v. No Named Defendant
Plaintiff: Jamie Williams
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Case Number: 1:2013cv03249
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINAL JUDGMENT, re: 50 by Clerk on 8/17/2015. (dhans, )
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/06/14. (nmarb, )
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/17/14. (nmmsl, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/3/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?