Edmond v. Broadmoor Hotel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Sean Edmond
Defendant: Broadmoor Hotel, Inc. and Dana Barton
Case Number: 1:2013cv03262
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Motion to Vacate. Case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/8/15.(jdyne, )
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/16/15. Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Discovery Responses [#35] is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. (lgale, )
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on September 8, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for August 19, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel who will try the case shall attend in person. The pro se plaintiff is permitted to appear by telephone by contacting Chambers at 303-844-4694 at the time of the scheduled conference. See the order for additional details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/20/2014. (rbjsec. )
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/15/14.(jdyne, )
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 23 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/27/14.(jdyne, )
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: 15 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/30/2014. (trlee, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/03/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmond v. Broadmoor Hotel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sean Edmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadmoor Hotel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?