Maralex Disposal. LLC v. Environmental Protection Agency, The
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency, The
Petitioner: Maralex Disposal. LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv03288
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Affirming Agency's Dismissal of Administrative Appeal as Untimely Under Abuse of Discretion Standard. Maralex's appeal of the EABs refusal to accept its untimely formal appeal has been considered and its Petition (Doc. 1) is DENIED. This ruling terminates the appeal and this Civil Action generally by Judge John L. Kane on 07/29/14. (jhawk, )
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint Case Management Plan for Peitions or Review of Agency Action. Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/19/2014. Adm Defendants Brief due by 6/18/2014. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 7/3/2014 by Judge John L. Kane on 04/18/14. (jhawk, )
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Transferring Case to AP Docket. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/24/2014. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maralex Disposal. LLC v. Environmental Protection Agency, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maralex Disposal. LLC
Represented By: William Edmond Zimsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?