Freeman v. Vineyard et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Freeman
Defendant: Alicia Vineyard and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2013cv03397
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT in favor of Alicia Vineyard against Demetrius Freeman re: 68 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Clerk on 7/9/15. (pglov)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2015. Granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion for Hearing/Conference. Denying 61 Motion for Discovery. FTR: Courtroom A402. (bdiem)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 7/9/2014. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Order 26 is DENIED as stated on the record. The issue of exhaustion will have to be resolved through further discovery and briefing. Discovery due by 10/10/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2014. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Assign Case. Mr. Freeman's claims against Defendant Vineyard do not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal and that the case should be assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Defendants Federal Bureau of Prisons and the "100 John and Jane Does" are DISMISSED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2014. (klyon, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/11/14. (nmarb, )
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/18/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Vineyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?