Arapahoe Surgery Center, LLC et al v. CIGNA Healthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arapahoe Surgery Center, LLC, Cherry Creek Surgery Center, LLC, Hampden Surgery Center, LLC, Kissing Camels Surgery Center, LLC, SurgCenter of Bel Air, LLC and Westminster Surgery Center, LLC
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare, Inc., Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, CIGNA Healthcare - Mid-Atlantic, Inc. and CIGNA Healthcare of Colorado, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03422
Filed: December 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/21/2016.(cthom, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that Counterclaim Defendants Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims ECF No. 43 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; The Motion is GRANTED as to Counterclaim Plaintiffs claims under RICO, COCCA, Colorado Criminal Code § 18- 4-405, and ERISA § 502(a) for restitution and declaratory relief, as well as state law claims for fraud, aiding and abetting fraud, negligent misrepresentation, and aiding and abetting misrepresentation, and those claims are DISMISSED; The Motion is DENIED as to Counterclaim Plaintiffs claims for injunctive relief under ERISA § 502(a), declaratory relief under Colorado Criminal Code § 18-13-119, and state law claims for unjust enrichment and tortious interference with contract, and those claims remain pending, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/6/2015.(evana, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 61 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts VI and VII of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/20/2015. (alowe)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2014. ORDERED: Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 48 is GRANTED as stated on the record. The Second Amended Complaint is deemed as filed today. Motion to Dismiss Counts VI and VII of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 41 is DENIED as MOOT. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arapahoe Surgery Center, LLC et al v. CIGNA Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arapahoe Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: William Tucker Brown
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Jane Winegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry Creek Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: William Tucker Brown
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Jane Winegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hampden Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: William Tucker Brown
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Jane Winegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kissing Camels Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: William Tucker Brown
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Jane Winegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SurgCenter of Bel Air, LLC
Represented By: William Tucker Brown
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Jane Winegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westminster Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: William Tucker Brown
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Jane Winegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare - Mid-Atlantic, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare of Colorado, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?