Lee v. Avago Technologies U.S. Inc.
Plaintiff: Sangho Lee
Defendant: Avago Technologies U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03450
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to pay his or its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/02/15. (jhawk, )
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Leave to Restrict ; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Leave to Restrict ; granting 75 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a motion, in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.2, should Plaintiff desire to maintain restriction with respect to the second amended restricted documents (ECF No. 76 ). By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/08/2015. (athom, )
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Setting Case For Trial. A five-day Jury Trial is set to commence on 5/16/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 4/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 05/28/2015. (athom, )
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery 29 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Based on the discussions held in court today, De fendant shall supplement its discovery responses on or before November 14, 2014. Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines for Disclosure of Plaintiff's Statistics Expert 39 is GRANTED. Discovery cut off: February 23, 2015. Dispositive Motions deadline: March 23, 2015. The Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and RESET to May 28, 2015 at 9:45 a.m. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 303-335-2780 at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than seven days before the Final Pretrial Conference. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/16/2014.(trlee, )
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/8/14. (sgrim)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/25/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Avago Technologies U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sangho Lee
Represented By: Karen Virginia Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?