State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Trane U.S. Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03498
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/3/14.(dkals, )
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/3/14. (msksec, )
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Stipulated Motion to Correct Party Name and Case Caption. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/25/2014.(klyon, )
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/27/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/27/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Trane U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Nathan D. Alder
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?