Gordon v. U.S.P. Florence A.D.MAX Staff's et al
Plaintiff: Alpheous E. Gordon
Defendant: W. Haygood, K. Fluck, D. Berkebile, U.S.P. Florence A.D.MAX Staff's and Davis
Case Number: 1:2013cv03506
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file a notice ofappeal, ECF No. 38 , filed on May 5, 2014, is DENIED pursuant Fed. R. App. P.4(a)(5)(A)(ii). Plaintiff's request for extension of time to requestreconsideration, ECF No. 38 , filed on May 5, 2014, is DENIED due to lack of Court authority. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/7/2014. (klyon, )
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 36 Order, by Clerk on 4/25/2014. (klyon, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/26/14 granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs request for an extension of time is granted. He shall have thirty days from the date of this Minute Order t o cure the deficiencies noted in the Courts December 30, 2013 Order. Plaintiffs request for appointment of counsel is denied. Plaintiff is granted an additional thirty days to comply with the December 30 Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send this Minute Order to Plaintiff using both names identified by Plaintiff, Orville Owen and Alpheous E. Gordon, inthe address.(nmarb, )
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/24/14 denying as unnecessary 9 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; denying as unnecessary 10 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; and denying as premature 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is reminded he has until February 18, 2014, tocomply with the Courts December 30, 2013 Order. (nmarb, )
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, and denying as unnecessary 3 Motion re: mail, filed by Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/30/13.(nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. U.S.P. Florence A.D.MAX Staff's et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Haygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Fluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Berkebile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.P. Florence A.D.MAX Staff's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpheous E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?