Reid et al v. Newalta Environmental Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Reid and Gordon Miller
Defendant: Newalta Environmental Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03507
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS AND APPROVE THE SETTLEMENT OF THIS FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR RULING APPROVING SETTLEMENT. SO ORDERED BY Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/19/2015. Text Only Entry(shart)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. Civil Action No. 14-cv-01037-CMA-CBS is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 13-cv-03507-CMA-CBS for all purposes. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/02/2014. (athom, )
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion for Amendment of the Court's January 23, 2014 "Order Granting Motion to Certify" by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/4/14.(dkals, )
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 12 Unopposed MOTION for Conditional Certification by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/23/14. All formal discovery is stayed. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid et al v. Newalta Environmental Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Reid
Represented By: Robert Eugene DeRose, II
Represented By: R. Andrew Santillo
Represented By: Peter David Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Miller
Represented By: Robert Eugene DeRose, II
Represented By: R. Andrew Santillo
Represented By: Peter David Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newalta Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca B. DeCook
Represented By: Lisa C. Diedrichs
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Dean Elliot Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?