Critten v. Castillo et al
Petitioner: Gerald Critten
Respondent: Juan D. Castillo, F.B.O.P. Regional Director and Linda T. McGrew
Case Number: 1:2014cv00015
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 8 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 filed, pro se, by Applicant, Gerald Critten, is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/2015. (mlace, )
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER To Respondent to File Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/10/14. (nmarb, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Petitioner To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/07/14. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Critten v. Castillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Critten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juan D. Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F.B.O.P. Regional Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda T. McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?