DeVaughn v. Solis
Plaintiff: Jay DeVaughn
Defendant: Solis
Case Number: 1:2014cv00139
Filed: January 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Gould, Andres Solis, C. Hendenskog against Jay DeVaughn pursuant to 62 Order, by Clerk on 12/31/2014. (eseam)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER accepting 60 Recommendation as follows: 24 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part, 38 Motion to Dismiss is granted, and Plaintiff's Motions to Amend Amended Complaint ( 46 and 52 ) are denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/30/14.(dkals, )
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/10/14. It is recommended that 24 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part, that 38 Motion to Dismiss be granted, and that 46 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and 52 Motion to Amend Complaint be denied. The First Motion 41 , Section Motion 44 , Third Motion 47 , Fourth Motion 51 , Fifth Motion 54 , and Sixth Motion 58 are denied as moot. (dkals, ) Modified on 12/11/2014 to change event (dkals, ).
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/24/14.(dkals, )
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/20/14 Denying without Prejudice Motion for Request to Amend Complaint 16 . (lgale)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/23/14. (nmarb, ) Modified on 1/23/2014 to correct typo error. (nmarb, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeVaughn v. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay DeVaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?