Cimino v. Long
Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Cimino
Defendant: Long
Case Number: 1:2014cv00209
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 33 Order. Signed by Clerk on 09/16/2014. (athom, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 31 August 21, 2014 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge: The Order to Show Cause (Doc. # 29 ) is MADE ABSOLUTE; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 22 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The Complaint (Doc. # 1 ) is DISMISSED; and This case is DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/15/2014. (athom, )
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/23/14. Motion for Default Judgment 17 is Denied.(lgale)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/25/14 Denying 14 Motion for Ex Parte Case Summary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail to Plaintiff a copy of this Minute Order along with a copy of the docket. (lgale)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be assigned to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/29/2014. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cimino v. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Cimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?