Solis v. Top Brass, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharyle A. Solis
Defendant: Top Brass, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00219
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. The case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear her or its own costs and fees except as provided otherwise by the parties' settlement agreement approved on September 3, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/7/14.(sgrim)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Approving Settlement; 20 Joint Motion for Court Approval of Settlement is GRANTED. No later than thirty days from this Order the Parties will file a joint stipulated Motion to Dismiss this case with prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/3/14.(morti, )
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 5/6/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Discovery due by 11/14/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2014. ORDERED: Defendant's Consent Motion to Amend Proposed Scheduling Ord er by Interlineation is GRANTED. The proposed scheduling order will reflect attorney L. Anthony George as appearing on behalf of Defendant. A Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for February 10, 2015 at 9:45 a.m. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 303- 335-2780 at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than seven days before the Final Pretrial Conference. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/6/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/5/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Top Brass, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharyle A. Solis
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Brass, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher John Eby
Represented By: Travis Reid Kearbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?