Geiger et al v. Master United 12 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Zach Geiger, Robert Abelardo, Adam Goldstein and Ryan King
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC, Paul Taylor, Kris Eszlinger, Frank Ley, Hans Prosch, Masters United 11, LLC, Masters United X, Inc., Kata 7, LLC, Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC, Z-Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLC, Z-Ultimate University of Martial Arts Professionals LLC, Masters United I LLC, Masters United III LLC, Masters United V LLC, Z-Ultimate Events LLC, A L Martial Arts, Inc., WLC Management, Inc., Masters United VI LLC, Masters United 8 LLC, Masters United 15 LLC, United Partners - Broomfield LLC, United Partners - Castle Rock LLC, United Partners - Centennial LLC, United Partners - Chicago #4 LLC, United Partners - Colorado Springs 1 LLC, United Partners - Denver LLC, United Partners - Denver South LLC, United Partners - Fort Collins LLC, United Partners - Glenview LLC, United Partners - Highlands Ranch LLC, United Partners - Highlands Ranch 2 LLC, United Partners - Kansas City #3 LLC, United Partners - Kansas City 1 LLC, United Partners - Kansas City #4 LLC, United Partners - Ken Caryle LLC, United Partners - Lafayette LLC, United Partners - Lakewood LLC, United Partners - Leawood LLC, United Partners - Littleton LLC, United Partners - Longmont LLC, United Partners - Olathe LLC, United Partners - Overland Park North LLC, United Partners - Overland Park South LLC, United Partners - Parker LLC, United Partners - Skokie LLC, United Partners - Smokey Hill LLC, United Partners - Thornton LLC, United Partners - West Arvada LLC, United Partners - Westminster LLC, United Partners - Wheat Ridge LLC, Z-Ultimate Colorado Springs, Z-Ultimate Denver, Z-Ultimate Highlands Ranch East, Z-Ultimate Parker, Z-Ultimate Smokey Hills, William Clark, Paul (I) Taylor, Kris (I) Eszlinger, Frank (I) Ley, Hans (I) Prosch, William (I) Clark, Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios and Masters United 12 LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00240
Filed: January 28, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0216 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 115 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt, Sanctions, and Relief from Dates in Order Granting Motion for Conditional Certification. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/30/2016.(cmira)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying 176 Motion to Quash; denying 177 Motion to Quash. The Division is directed to produce the responsive documents for inspection at the location where the responsive documents are located on November 6, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/28/15. (nywlc1)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION Master United 12 LLC, Ultimate Partners Arvada LLC, Ultimate Partners Boulder LLC, Ultimate Partners Colo Springs 2 LLC, Ultimate Partners Colorado Springs 1 LLC, Ultimate Partners Fort Collins LLC, Ultimate Partners Gle nview LLC, Ultimate Partners Provo LLC, Ultimate Partners South Ogden, Ultimate Partners West Jordan, United Partners Castle Rock LLC, Z-Masters Development Group 1 LLC and Zen Combat International added. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/6/2015. (mlace, )
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/15/15. (bsimm, )
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying 114 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion to Compel. Defendants must supplement their discovery responses, consistent with this Order, no later than June 10, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/26/15. (nywlc1)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/22/15 DENYING 134 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum w Exhibit A filed by Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Unemployment Insurance. The Division is directed to produce the responsive documents to the Second Subpoena on May 29, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-205 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294, or as otherwise agreed to in writing by Plaintiffs and the Division. FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of the Court is directed to RESTRICT document [#114-12] with a Level 1 Restriction. (nmarb, )
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum 134 is GRANTED, with separate Order to issue. Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions 114 is TA KEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiffs' 3rd Motion to Compel 131 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Parties shall file a formal supplement to discovery responses, including certification, and a proposed Protective Order on or before 6/3/2015. Separate order to issue. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: 10-Day Jury Trial set for 7/18/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/24/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/30/2015. (alowe)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 101 Joint Motion to Vacate Trial and Related Dates. The combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/24/2015 at 10:30 AM; and the trial date set to begin 5/11/2015 are vacated and continued pending further order. Counsel shall contact the administrative assistant of the court on 4/24/2015 at 10:30 AM to reschedule the trial and antecedent combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/17/2105.(alowe)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery, Second Motion to Compel Discovery, and Motion for Sanctions and Contempt of Court. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/9/2015. (alowe)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying without prejudice 33 Motion for Equitable Tolling. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/11/2015. (alowe)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Approval. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/10/2015.(alowe)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendants shall provide a Notice of Representation, identifying all parties whom counsel represents, on or before March 9, 2015. Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery, Second Motion to Compel Discovery, and Motion for Sanctions and Contempt of Court 68 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 98 Motion for Attorney Fees. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/13/2015.(alowe)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 86 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/11/2014.(alowe)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/10/14 re: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Status Conference 87 . The Motion is GRANTED. (bsimm)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/14 re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Order for Spoliation Sanctions 52 . The Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED as specified. The sanction awarded, however, is limited to the plaintiffs' reasonable expenses, including attorneys' fees, incurred in connection with the despoiled discovery. No later than 12/15/2014, the plaintiffs shall file a fee application. (bsimm, )
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/6/14. At the conclusion of the hearing on October 3, 2014, parties shall retain custody of their respective exhibits until such time as all need for the exhibits has terminated. (bsimm, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/1/14. The Motion to Quash 70 is DENIED. The Division shall produce the documents subject to the commands of the Subpoena on October 3, 2014, at 8:30 a.m., in courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (bsimm, )
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 52 Motion for TRO. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/26/2014.(trlee, )
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/21/14. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery 43 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Award of reasonable expenses and attorney's fees to be paid to the plaintiffs in connection with the Mot ion to Compel is made jointly and severally against the defendants and their lawyers. Plaintiffs' Motion to Join Additional Defendants Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 19 and 20 46 is GRANTED. On or before August 27, 2014, the plaintiffs shall file a caption listing all plaintiffs and all defendants joined in the action to date. (bsimm, )
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER denying 51 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The motion is DENIED without prejudice for lack of compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER approving 40 withdrawing Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Conditional Action Certification and Notice Approval. Plaintiffs' Motion For Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Approval [# 34 ] filed June 27, 2014, is WITHDRAWN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/11/2014.(klyon, )
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 4/24/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set 5/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/14. (rebsec)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant, Masters United X, Inc., Only. The Unopposed Motion To Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Masters United X, Inc. [# 31 ] filed June 24, 2014, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Masters United X, Inc., are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2014.(klyon, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The proposed Civil Scheduling Order [Doc. # 27 ] is REFUSED. A supplemental scheduling conference is set for July 8, 2014, at 2:30 p.m., inCourtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall submit a revised proposed scheduling order on or before July 1, 2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/27/2014. (klyon, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/26/14. Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (Simmons, B.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger et al v. Master United 12 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Geiger
Represented By: Christopher Barr Davlin
Represented By: Coren Ray Hinkle
Represented By: Todd Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Abelardo
Represented By: Christopher Barr Davlin
Represented By: Coren Ray Hinkle
Represented By: Todd Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Goldstein
Represented By: Christopher Barr Davlin
Represented By: Coren Ray Hinkle
Represented By: Todd Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan King
Represented By: Christopher Barr Davlin
Represented By: Coren Ray Hinkle
Represented By: Todd Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Eszlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Ley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Prosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United 11, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United X, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kata 7, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate University of Martial Arts Professionals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United V LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Events LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A L Martial Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLC Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United VI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United 8 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United 15 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Broomfield LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Castle Rock LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Centennial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Chicago #4 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Colorado Springs 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Denver LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Denver South LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Fort Collins LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Glenview LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Highlands Ranch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Highlands Ranch 2 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Kansas City #3 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Kansas City 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Kansas City #4 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Ken Caryle LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Lafayette LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Lakewood LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Leawood LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Littleton LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Longmont LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Olathe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Overland Park North LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Overland Park South LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Parker LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Skokie LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Smokey Hill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Thornton LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - West Arvada LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Westminster LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Partners - Wheat Ridge LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Colorado Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Highlands Ranch East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Smokey Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul (I) Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris (I) Eszlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank (I) Ley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans (I) Prosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William (I) Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters United 12 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?