Hammond v. I.C.C.S. et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Hammond
Defendant: I.C.C.S., Department of Corrections, State of Colorado, Susan Keller, Greg Kildow, Jeff Geist and Geri Anna
Case Number: 1:2014cv00242
Filed: January 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting 83 Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/2/2015. The Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [filed 3/29/2015; docket #83] is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case.(mdave, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 105 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Porch Exhibit, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/07/15.(nmarb, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER granting 82 Motion for the Court's Assistance in Order for Plaintiff to Attend Hearing Telephonically; denying 84 Motion to Vacate Motions Hearing Set for April 7, 2015, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/30/2015.(slibi, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 62 Motion to Issue Subpoenas; denying as moot 63 Motion to Reschedule Trial Date by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/9/2015.(mdave)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/30/2014.(slibi, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Stay of Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss. This matter is hereby STAYED pending further order of the Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/16/2014.(slibi, )
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER In the interest of justice, Plaintiffs renewed Motion to Amend Pleading filed August 5,2014; docket # 46 is granted. In light of this order, Defendants 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed June 6, 2014; docket # 33 is denied as moot with leave to re-file, if Defendants so choose, in response to the Third Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/5/2014.(evana, )
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Drawing Case to a presiding judge and, if appropriate,to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/02/2014. (agarc, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/03/2014. (slibi, )
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/28/2014. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. I.C.C.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C.C.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kildow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Geist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geri Anna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?