Gassel v. American Pizza Partners LP et al
Plaintiff: Mike Gassel
Defendant: American Pizza Partners, L.P., American Restaurant Partners, L.P. and RMC American Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00291
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Approve Collective Action Settlement [Docket No. 96] and Application for Fees, Costs and Expenses [Docket No. 98 (public entry at Docket No. 100)] are DENIED without prejudice. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/08/15.(jhawk, )
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery Cut Off by 2/13/2015. Dispositive Motions deadline by 3/13/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland.By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/6/2014.(agarc, )
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Collective Action Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs Amended Complaint on or before June 4, 2014 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/28/14.(jhawk, )
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Approve Stipulated Form of Notice of Collective Action 27 is GRANTED. by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/14/2014.(trlee, )
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/14/14. (bsimm)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/26/14. Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (Simmons, B.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gassel v. American Pizza Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Gassel
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pizza Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Restaurant Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC American Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?