Richwine v. Community College of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Celine Richwine
Defendant: Gary Sawyer, Community College of Denver and Christopher Budden
Case Number: 1:2014cv00325
Filed: February 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/04/2014. (athom, )
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Unopposed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendants Gary Sawyer and Christopher Budden and to Voluntarily Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Third Claims for Relief. Defendants Gary Sawyer and Christopher Budden are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Second and Third Claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall pay his, her or its own costs, attorneys fees and expenses. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/16/2014. (athom, )
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/17/2014. (cbslc1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richwine v. Community College of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Sawyer
Represented By: Alison Faryl Kyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community College of Denver
Represented By: Alison Faryl Kyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Budden
Represented By: Alison Faryl Kyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celine Richwine
Represented By: Mary Josephine Lowrey
Represented By: Sarah J. Parady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?