Deneffe v. Skywest, Inc.

Plaintiff: Frederic Charles Deneffe
Defendant: Skywest, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00348
Filed: February 7, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part as to Plaintiff's Title VII claim for relief and denying in part as to Plaintiff's ADEA claim for relief 92 Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 56.1 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/26/2016. Count 1 of the 48 Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice.(mdave, )
October 27, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 88 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, Discovery due by 1/4/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2016, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/27/2015.(slibi, )
October 21, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 86 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/21/2015.(slibi, )
August 7, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 80 Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer and Separate Defenses, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/07/2015.(slibi, )
August 6, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/06/2015.(slibi, )
June 10, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/10/2015. Discovery due by 11/2/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2015. (mdave, )
May 11, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/11/15 DENYING 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Status Conference set for 5/26/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(nmarb, )
January 16, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS: Defendant's 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint on or before 1/20/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/16/2015. (alowe)
October 28, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion to Toll Discovery Deadlines Pending Order on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, construed by the Court as a motion for temporary stay of the proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/28/2014.(slibi, )
August 19, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2014. (slibi, )
July 10, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/10/2014. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deneffe v. Skywest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederic Charles Deneffe
Represented By: Subhashini Bollini
Represented By: Rosemary Orsini(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skywest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?