Zheng v. Nexion Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bixuan Zheng
Defendant: Nexion Health at Cherry Creek, Inc. and Nexion Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00409
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of dismissal, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/13/2014. (trlee, )
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend SchedulingOrder to Extend Deadline to Join Parties and Amend Pleadings. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/1/2014.(klyon, )
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/21/2014. (trlee, )
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Consolidation of Actions. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/2014.(klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zheng v. Nexion Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexion Health at Cherry Creek, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexion Health, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bixuan Zheng
Represented By: David Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?