Boetger v. Burnell et al
Petitioner: Michael A Boetger
Respondent: Burnell and John W. Suthers
Case Number: 1:2014cv00675
Filed: March 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/16/15. ORDERED that the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 [Docket No. 1], filed by Michael A. Boetger on March 4, 2014, is denied a nd this action is dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that no certificate of appealability shall issue because Applicant hasnot made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2); Fed. R. Gover ning Section 2254 Cases 11(a); Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 483-85 (2000). It is further ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this or der would not be taken in good faith. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). IfApplicant files a notice of appeal he must also pay the full $505.00 appellate filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit within thirty days in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24. (kpreu)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and for Answer. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/26/15. (jhawk, )
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Drawing Case; This case shall be drawn to a district judge, or, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/13/15. (morti, )
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Motion to Strike Pre-Answer Response, Directing Respondents to Remail Pre-Answer Response, And Granting Extension to File Reply, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/22/14.(morti, )
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER; 11 Motion of Inquiry and Direction filed by Applicant is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/9/14.(morti, )
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/05/14. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boetger v. Burnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael A Boetger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W. Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?